Arkalon Grazing Association v. Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arkalon Grazing Association
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2009cv01394
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Seward
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant Chesapeake Operating Inc.'s 241 Motion to Decertify Class. Further, denying without prejudice 257 and 260 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/07/2014. (mg)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 140 Defendant's Motion to Compel; granting 150 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 5/31/2012. (sj)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 130 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Summary Judgment Motion to Eliminate Need for Further Discovery. Defendant shall file an amended motion for partial summary judgment and its proposed memorandum in suppor t within ten (10) days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's response to the motion will be due on or before thirty (30) days from the date that defendant's motion is filed. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/8/2012. (jw)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify, Reconsider, Alter or Amend, Grant Relief From, or Stay Magistrate's Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 5/6/2011. (sj)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and to Appoint Plaintiff's Counsel as Counsel for the Class. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/31/2011. (jw)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Defendant's request for an order quashing plaintiff's deposition notice, in its present form, is granted. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 12/14/10. (sj)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/4/2010. (cm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkalon Grazing Association v. Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkalon Grazing Association
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Coykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?