Kastner v. Intrust Bank et al
Plaintiff: Kristofer Thomas Kastner
Defendant: Intrust Bank, C.Q. Chandler, Roger W. Lemon, Michael P. Cannady and David Sutton
Case Number: 6:2010cv01012
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 184 Motion to Strike; granting 192 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 208 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying 209 Motion for Oral Argument; denying as moot 211 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/25/2013. (alm)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 181 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 186 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Sur-Reply; denying 187 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 1/25/2013. (sj)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 189 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 1/7/2013. (sj)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 161 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Experts and for Order Precluding Plaintiff from Presenting Expert Testimony; finding as moot 164 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions. Plaintiff's deadline for providing his Rule 26(a)(2)(B) expert reports for Smith, Whitman, Rosenwald and Campisi is 11/9/2012; defendants' deadline for producing expert witness disclosures is 11/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 10/23/2012. (sj)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 8/28/2012. (sj)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 149 Defendants' Motion for Ruling Regarding Depositions. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 7/26/2012. (sj)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 142 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 7/23/2012. (sj)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 120 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 122 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; finding as moot 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 126 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 128 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 137 Plaintiff's Motion to subpoena financial records. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 5/31/2012. (sj)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 116 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/15/2012. (cm)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 90 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 100 Motion for Trust Disbursement; denying 104 Motion for Order of Trust Disbursement. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/31/2011. (cm)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 8/26/2011. (sj)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 80 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All claims are dismissed other than Plaintiff's breach of trust claim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/1/2011.Mailed to pro se party Kristofer Thomas Kastner by regular mail (cm)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 64 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint; and granting 66 Defendant's Motion to Strike. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 2/22/2011. (sj)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART as to claims one, two, three, five and six and DENYING IN PART as to claims four, seven, eight and nine regarding 17 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/15/10. (alm)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; denying without prejudice 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; finding as moot 39 Defendant's Motion to Strike; finding as moot 40 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 11/10/10. (sj)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 46 Motion to Disqualify. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/5/2010. (cm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kastner v. Intrust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristofer Thomas Kastner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.Q. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?