Eastman et al v. Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC
Plaintiff: Benjamin M. Eastman and Marcita K. Eastman
Defendant: Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC
Case Number: 6:2010cv01216
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Monti L. Belot
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Bostwick
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 2/5/2014. (smg)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NUNC PRO TUNC MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. This corrected order has an unnecessary word omitted on page 7. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 8/5/2013. (aa)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF DISCOVERY. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/14/2011. (aw)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 3/16/2011. (rm) (Main Document 38 replaced on 3/16/2011) (rm).
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying 16 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 11/19/10.. (rm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman et al v. Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin M. Eastman
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcita K. Eastman
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?