Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc. v. Cintas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.
Defendant: Cintas Corporation and Cintas #2
Case Number: 6:2011cv01067
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Motion for Judgment. Cintas' motion for judgment as a matter of law is granted as to UVS' punitive damages claim and denied as to the remaining claims. Cintas' motion for a new trial is denied. Cintas' motion to alter or amend the judgment is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 09/08/2014. (aa)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 121 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 04/16/2014. (aa)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 11/22/2013. (aa)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.. The motion is granted with respect to plaintiffs tortious interference and unjust enrichment claims, on which claims defendants are awarded judgment. The motion is otherwise denied. It is further ordered that the 75 Plaintif's Motion for Oral Argument on defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/22/2013. (ses)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc. v. Cintas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Amy S. Lemley
Represented By: James M. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M. Bradshaw
Represented By: David T. Bules
Represented By: Drew M. Hicks
Represented By: Jamie M. Ramsey
Represented By: Gregory M. Utter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas #2
Represented By: Thomas M. Bradshaw
Represented By: David T. Bules
Represented By: Drew M. Hicks
Represented By: Jamie M. Ramsey
Represented By: Gregory M. Utter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?