Molina v. Perez et al

Plaintiff: Jacob Molina
Defendant: Greg Perez and Karl Timmons
Case Number: 6:2013cv01025
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 96 defendants' Renewed Motion for Qualified Immunity; and denying as moot 100 defendants' Motion for Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/3/15. (mss)
November 20, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 18 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 31 plaintiff's Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 11/19/2013. (mss)
December 17, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 59 defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/17/14. (mss)
January 20, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 defendants' Motion in Limine; granting 81 plaintiff's Motion to Modify; granting in part and denying in part 82 plaintiff's Motion in Limine; and granting 91 plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/20/15. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Molina
Represented By: Molly M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.