McDonald v. Wichita, Kansas, City of, et al.
Plaintiff: Mary McDonald
Defendant: Wichita, Kansas, City of and Gary Rebenstorf
Case Number: 6:2014cv01020
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 191 Movants' Unopposed Motion for Relief from the Court's Disqualification Orders; granting 194 Movants' Renewed Unopposed Motion for Relief from the Court's Disqualification Orders. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/11/17. (sj)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 138 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 141 Defendants' Motion in Limine. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/13/17. (sj)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Overruling 60 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' Motion To File Documents Under Seal (Doc #60) filed May 22, 2015 be and hereby is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before June 20, 2015, defendants may file an unsealed memorandum and the exhibits in support of their motion for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 06/15/2015. (sv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Wichita, Kansas, City of, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McDonald
Represented By: Sean M. McGivern
Represented By: Donald N. Peterson, II
Represented By: Joseph A. Schremmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita, Kansas, City of
Represented By: Derek S. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rebenstorf
Represented By: Derek S. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?