Ochs et al. v. Log Homes of America, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Shane Ochs and Donna Ochs
Defendant: Kevin Hylton, Log Homes Of America, Inc., 5 Star Log Homes, JCO Framing, Inc., Saldivar Javier Puga and Juan Puga
Case Number: 6:2014cv01273
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Gove
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 134 Motion for Default Judgment. The clerks is directed to enter judgment accordingly. The judgment shall also reflect the dismissal with prejudice of the claims against defendants Log Homes of America, Inc., Five Star Log Homes, and Kevin Hylton, doing business as Five Star Log Homes. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/9/2018. (sz)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 124 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/3/2017. (sz)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the protective order submitted by the parties. The court notes that although the signature lines for Caleb Boone and Kevin Hylton are blank, counsel for defendant Log Homes of America, Inc., has represented to the court that Mr. Boone and Mr. Hylton have approved the stipulated order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/4/2015. (ah)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment against JCO Framing, Inc.; denying 14 plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment against Juan Puga; and denying 15 plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment aga inst Saldivar Javier Puga. Default is entered against JCO Framing, Inc., Juan Puga and Saldivar Javier Puga, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(a). Defendants Puga, Puga and JCO Framing, Inc. to show cause within 20 days of the filing of this Order why th e court should not grant plaintiffs' Motions for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/5/15.Mailed to pro se parties Saldivar Javier Puga, Juan Puga, and JCO Framing, Inc. by certified mail. Certified Tracking Number: 70123050000111902842; 70123050000111902835; 70123050000111902859 (mss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochs et al. v. Log Homes of America, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Ochs
Represented By: T. Caleb Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ochs
Represented By: T. Caleb Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hylton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Log Homes Of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Star Log Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCO Framing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saldivar Javier Puga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Puga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?