Violetta v. Steven Brothers Sports Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven M. Violetta
Defendant: Steven Brothers Sports Management, LLC, Brandon Steven and Rodney Steven
Counter_claimant: Rodney Steven, Brandon Steven and Steven Brothers Sports Management, LLC
Counter_defendant: Steven M. Violetta
Case Number: 6:2016cv01193
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 154 Motion to Clarify; denying as moot 154 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 156 Motion in Limine to Exclude General Financial Information; granting 157 Motion in Limine to Exclude Impermissible Character Evidence; granting 159 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Job Performance. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/16/2018. (mam)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 147 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/31/2018. (sz)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 138 Defendants' Motion to Find SummaryJudgment Motion Uncontested ; granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 140 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/26/2018. (sz)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendants shall produce those documents ordered produced no later than 14 days following the filing of this Order. A supplemental scheduling confere nce is set for September 13, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone conference call to be initiated by the Court. Plaintiff must submit a revised report of parties' planning conference no later than September 6, 2017. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/24/17. (sj)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion. Plaintiff's claim for attorney fees against SBSM is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/31/2017. (sz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Violetta v. Steven Brothers Sports Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Violetta
Represented By: Boyd A. Byers
Represented By: Sarah Burch Macke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Brothers Sports Management, LLC
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Steven
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Steven
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Rodney Steven
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Brandon Steven
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steven Brothers Sports Management, LLC
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Steven M. Violetta
Represented By: Boyd A. Byers
Represented By: Sarah Burch Macke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?