Owen v. District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Owen
Defendant: District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas, Department for Children and Families, Kansas, State of, Stephanie Uhlik and Kasey Shepherd
Case Number: 6:2017cv01036
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 12 Report and Recommendations. The plaintiff's case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 07/27/2017. (aa)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 3 and 9 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 and 10 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/9/17. Mailed to pro se party Teresa Ann Owen by certified mail - Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3269. (sj)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO GIVE CUSTODY OF CHILDREN TO PARENTS (filed as Motion for Injunctive Relief). Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/15/2017. Mailed to pro se party Teresa Ann Owen by regular mail. (mam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department for Children and Families, Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Uhlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?