Basic v. Boeing Corporation
Plaintiff: Steven Basic
Defendant: Boeing Corporation
Case Number: 6:2017cv01103
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 11 Motion to Produce. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/13/2017.Mailed to pro se party Steven Basic by regular mail (cm)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 5 Report and Recommendations. This case is therefore DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 05/26/2017. Mailed to pro se party Steven Basic by regular mail. (aa)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This document also serves as the Report & Recommendation of Dismissal to the District Court. It is included in the Court's electronic filing system as two documents/events for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/12/17. Mailed to pro se party Steven Basic by regular mail. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basic v. Boeing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Basic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?