Peoples v. Wichita State University

Plaintiff: Darrell Peoples
Defendant: Wichita State University
Case Number: 6:2018cv01010
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Referring Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (The motion is DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's claim under Title VII for discrimination based on race. It is GRANTED with respect t o all other claims.); granting 44 Defendant Rowe's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 46 Motion for Default Judgment; finding as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 10/16/2018. Mailed to pro se party Darrell Peoples at 1653 N. Bluff Street, Wichita, KS 67208 by regular mail. (aa)
June 20, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's 24 Motion For Leave to Respond Out of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted until July 9, 2018 to file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, the court will grant Defendant's pending motion to dismiss, and the action will be dismissed. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 06/20/2018. Mailed to pro se party Darrell Peoples at 1653 N. Bluff, Wichita, KS 67208 by regular mail. (aa)
May 3, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 15 Order denying his motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/3/2018. (Mailed to pro se plaintiff by regular mail.) (byk)
March 16, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Plaintiff's renewed Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/16/2018. (Copy of Ordermailed to pro se plaintiff Darrell Peoples by regular mail.) (byk)
January 19, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/19/2018. (Mailed to pro se plaintiff Darrell Peoples by regular mail.) (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. Wichita State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita State University
Represented By: Molly M. Gordon
Represented By: David H. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?