Sprint Communications Company v. A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. and Merillat, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01244
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
0 Judge: John W Broomes
1 Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P. Regarding Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Vines, Monte)
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. of taking deposition of Sprint Representative on 10/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Martin, Lisa)
October 18, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc.. (Gosch, Neil)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Defendant A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. of taking deposition of Rylie Equipment & Contracting Co on 10/31/2018 (Gosch, Neil)
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE by A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. of Subpoena to TranSystems Corporation (Gosch, Neil)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P. of taking deposition of Keith Hostetler on October 30, 2018 (Vines, Monte)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company L.P. of Discovery Requests (Vines, Monte)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of 30(b)(6) Deposition Duces Tecum by A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. of Sprint Communications Company corporate representative (Gosch, Neil)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/21/2018. (mn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 06/12/2018)(aa)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORDS from Eighteenth Judicial District, Sedgwick County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit)(Gosch, Neil)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Pollick for Sprint Communications Company L.P. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/5/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hl)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Communications Company L.P. identifying Sprint Corporation as corporate parent (Vines, Monte)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Mark Pollick to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4574718.) by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Pollick, #2 Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Vines, Monte)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company L.P. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Vines, Monte)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Monte A. Vines on behalf of Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Vines, Monte)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROTECTIVE ORDER limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/4/2018. (byk)
August 29, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Martin on behalf of A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc.. (Martin, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. identifying none as corporate parent . (Gosch, Neil)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Gosch, Neil)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc.. (Gosch, Neil)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2018-CV-1181. Trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4570027), filed by A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gosch, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company v. A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M. Cohron & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Neil C. Gosch
Represented By: Lisa Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merillat, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Skolaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Monte A. Vines
Represented By: Mark Pollick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?