O'Sullivan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Rebecca A O'Sullivan and Rebecca A. O'Sullivan
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv01250
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
1 Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 7 Featured Case INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/28/18. (alm)
September 28, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
September 11, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Petition. Defendant's Answer due 10/2/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/11/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
September 10, 2018 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond as to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer). (Davidson, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2018 to change the motion type. (mam)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
September 4, 2018 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Davidson, Steven)
September 4, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Davidson, Steven)
September 4, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sedgwick County, case number 2018-CV-1783 . Trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4574637), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Removal)(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Sullivan v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A. O'Sullivan
Represented By: Donald N. Peterson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?