Ziboon v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Saad Ziboon
Defendant: Dawn C. Henderson, David Douglas, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, Christopher A. Wray and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 6:2018cv01257
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Dispositive Motion re #1 Complaint. Deadline extended until January 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/9/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Dispositive Motion by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, David Douglas, Dawn C. Henderson, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, Christopher A. Wray (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Jacobs, Michelle)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle A. Jacobs on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, David Douglas, Dawn C. Henderson, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, Christopher A. Wray. (Jacobs, Michelle)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summonses and Complaint by Mohammed Saad Ziboon (Link, David)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to L. Francis Cissna, David Douglas, Dawn C. Henderson, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, Christopher A. Wray and U.S. Attorney. (Summons for U.S. Attorney General not issued at this time.) (issued to Attorney for service) (aa)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Mohammed Saad Ziboon. (Link, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4580525), filed by Mohammed Saad Ziboon. (Link, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziboon v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Saad Ziboon
Represented By: David K. Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn C. Henderson
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Douglas
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?