Heritage Family Church, Inc. et al v. Kansas Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Dudley, Eric D. Sims and Heritage Family Church, Inc.
Defendant: Clarence Harris, Jr., Tom Brown, Grady Osborn, Jessica Link, Joe Norwood, Johnnie Goddard, Gloria Geither, Eric Shaver, Daryl Kats, Kansas Department of Corrections, Doug Burris and Ashley R. Rafferty
Case Number: 6:2018cv01259
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Kenneth G Gale
1 Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Related Rule 26 Activities with Memorandum in Support Incorporated by Defendants Kansas Department of Corrections, Joe Norwood (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carter, Natasha)
October 31, 2018 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Joe Norwood(Carter, Natasha)
October 31, 2018 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Joe Norwood (Carter, Natasha)
October 31, 2018 17 MOTION to Dismiss with Memorandum in Support Incorporated by Defendant Kansas Department of Corrections (Carter, Natasha)
October 29, 2018 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: MOTION HEARING held on 10/29/2018 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Heritage Family Church, Inc., Jonathan A. Dudley, Eric D. Sims. (Court Reporter Jo Wilkinson.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
October 25, 2018 15 RESPONSE by Defendants Kansas Department of Corrections, Joe Norwood re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit - Redacted F, #7 Exhibit - Redacted G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Carter, Natasha)
October 18, 2018 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims (Turner, Patrick)
October 18, 2018 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims (Turner, Patrick)
October 18, 2018 12 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Eric D. Sims, Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc. upon Kansas Department of Corrections - Jackson Street office (Turner, Patrick)
October 18, 2018 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Eric D. Sims, Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc. upon Joe Norwood served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/31/2018 (Turner, Patrick)
October 18, 2018 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Eric D. Sims, Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc. upon Kansas Department of Corrections served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/31/2018 (Turner, Patrick)
October 17, 2018 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/31/2018 for Defendants Kansas Department of Corrections & Joe Norwood to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/17/2018. (aa)
October 16, 2018 8 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Wichita Courtroom 408 (EFM) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
October 8, 2018 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Ex A - Offender Record, #3 Ex B -Dudley Certification, #4 Ex C - Sims Certification, #5 Ex D - Heritage Religious Tenets Table Complaint, #6 Ex E - Heritage Kansas Dep of Corrections Religious Affiliation Info, #7 Ex F - 9-13-16 Sims to Kats explaining cant meet with Protestants, #8 Ex G - 12-2-16 email from Pastor to Gloria, #9 Ex H - 12-10-16 Sims letter asking for baptism at NCF, #10 Ex I - Baptism Denials, #11 Ex J - 12-13-16 Geither to Sims saying Apostolic recognized, #12 Ex K - Guinn Affidavit Complaint, #13 Ex L - 1-4-18 Chaplain to Sims re No need to meet, change form, #14 Ex M - 1-16-18 note to Sims from chaplain re no apostolic, #15 Ex N - May 2017 Ltr with Weekly callouts at each place, #16 Ex O - March 27 ltr to Sims from Geither, #17 Ex P - Demand Ltr, #18 Ex Q - Heritage hand written letter to D. Cortez dated 05-23-18, #19 Ex R - Bureau of Justice Ltr TRO, #20 Ex. S - Heritage Florida Dept of Corrections Inmate Request No. 18, #21 Ex T - KAR 76-3002 TRO, #22 Ex U - FDOC 33-601-401 TRO Exhibit U, #23 Ex V - Burris Aug 18 Ltr)(Turner, Patrick)
October 8, 2018 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims (Turner, Patrick). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 10/10/2018 (aa).
September 24, 2018 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas Department of Corrections. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
September 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas Department of Corrections & Joe Norwood. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
September 14, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel O. Cortez for Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., and Eric D. Sims pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. (Pro hac vice fee $50 paid Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4582719.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/14/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
September 14, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims. (Turner, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 3 MOTION for attorney Daniel O. Cortez to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4582719) by Plaintiffs Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims. (Attachments: #1 Cortez Affidavit, #2 Cortez Filing Form)(Turner, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc., Eric D. Sims. (Turner, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4582643), filed by Eric D. Sims, Jonathan A. Dudley, Heritage Family Church, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Ex. A - Offender Record, #3 Ex. AA - Gloria Geither to Pastor Dudley Dated 03-12-18, #4 Ex. B - Dudley Certification, #5 Ex. BB - Email from Grady Osborn Dated 08-13-18, #6 Ex. C - Sims Certification, #7 Ex. CC - Email from Grady Osborn dated 08-16-18, #8 Ex. D - Heritage Religious Tenets Table Complaint, #9 Ex. DD - Osborn emails Feb 18, #10 Ex. E - IMPP 10-110D, #11 Ex. EE - Response to Demand Letter, #12 Ex. F - Heritage Kanas Dep of Coprrections Religious Affiliation Info, #13 Ex. FF - Heritage Florida Dept of Corrections Inmate Rquest Nov. 18, #14 Ex. G - Request for Accommodation, #15 Ex. GG - Burris Aug 18 Ltr Complaint, #16 Ex. H - 9-13-16 Sims to Kats explaining can't meet with Protestants, #17 Ex. I - 12-2-16 email from Pastor to Gloria, #18 Ex. J - 12-10-16 Sims letter asking for baptism at NCF, #19 Ex. K Baptism Denials, #20 Ex. L - 12-13-16 Geither to Sims saying Apostolic recognized, #21 Ex. M - 12-20-16 Sims ltr to Geither re he is not protestant Complaint, #22 Ex. N - Guinn Affidavit Complaint, #23 Ex. O - Cook Gonzales Peckham Affidavits, #24 Ex. P - 3-23-17 Sims note re being told no group bible study, #25 Ex. Q - May 2017 Ltr with Weekly callouts at each place Complaint, #26 Ex. R - Kelley Settlement Agreement Complaint Ex. R(1), #27 Ex. S - 1-4-18 Chaplain to Sims re No need to meet, change form, #28 Ex. T - 1-16-18 note to Sims from chaplain re no apostolic, #29 Ex. U - March 27 ltr to Sims from Geither, #30 Ex. V - Demand Ltr, #31 Ex. W - Heritage hand written letter to D. Cortez dated 05-23-18, #32 Ex. X - Bureau of Justice Ltr TRO, #33 Ex. Y - PREA Ltr dated 05-04-18, #34 Ex. Z - IMPP 13-101D)(Turner, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Family Church, Inc. et al v. Kansas Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Norwood
Represented By: Natasha M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Geither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections
Represented By: Natasha M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley R. Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Dudley
Represented By: Daniel O. Cortez
Represented By: Patrick A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D. Sims
Represented By: Daniel O. Cortez
Represented By: Patrick A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Family Church, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel O. Cortez
Represented By: Patrick A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?