Sharrai v. CHW Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Sharrai
Defendant: CHW Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01273
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CHW Group, Inc. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/9/2018. (mam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by David Sharrai. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Molner, Mark)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by David Sharrai upon CHW Group, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018 (Molner, Mark)
October 3, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHW Group, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff David Sharrai - trial to be held in Wichita. (Molner, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff David Sharrai. (Molner, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4599213), filed by David Sharrai. (Molner, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharrai v. CHW Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sharrai
Represented By: Mark D. Molner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHW Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?