Moser v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: Todd Moser
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2018cv01284
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #4 Return of Service of Summons executed as to USA: The U.S. Attorney was served on 10/24/2018 by certified mail, answer due 12/24/2018. The original entry included the wrong service date/answer date. (mam)
November 20, 2018 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Moser upon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Office of Regional Counsel 10/25/18)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Moser upon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Atty General 10/29/18)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 4 Summons Returned Executed -- Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/24/2018 by certified mail, answer due 12/24/2018. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 10/24/18)(Overton, Kathleen) Modified on 11/26/2018 to correct the service date and answer date. (mam)
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (mam)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
October 11, 2018 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Todd Moser - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen)
October 11, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Todd Moser. (Overton, Kathleen)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4605091.), filed by Todd Moser.(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moser v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Moser
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?