Travelers Indemnity Company, The v. P1 Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Indemnity Company, The
Defendant: P1 Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01287
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Teresa J James
1 Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 6 Featured Case INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. To join the conference, counsel shall dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/6/2018. (ts)
November 5, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by P1 Group, Inc..(Murphy, Patrick)
October 30, 2018 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Federal Express by Travelers Indemnity Company, The upon P1 Group, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018 (Casey, Derek)
October 15, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as corporate parent . (Casey, Derek)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to P1 Group, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Travelers Indemnity Company. (Casey, Derek)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4606334.), filed by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Casey, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company, The v. P1 Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P1 Group, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Derek S. Casey
Represented By: Lisa Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company, The
Represented By: Lisa Martin
Represented By: Derek S. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?