Hirsu v. Social Networking Technology, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tatiana Hirsu
Defendant: Massimo Messina, Carlos Amezcua, Sharon Amezcua, Social Networking Technology, Inc., Stuart Bruck, Kevin Owens and David M. McNamee
Case Number: 6:2018cv01343
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Yes by Tatiana Hirsu upon Sharon Amezcua served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019 (Andrusak, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Yes by Tatiana Hirsu upon Carlos Amezcua served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019 (Andrusak, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Social Network Technologies, Inc., Stuart Bruck, David M. McNamee, Massimo Messina, Kevin Owens.(Hollander, Ross) Modified on 2/7/2019 to add Social Network Technologies, Inc. as a filer. (mam)
February 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carlos Amezcua, Sharon Amezcua. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry). (jk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Network Technologies, Inc., Stuart Bruck, David M. McNamee, Massimo Messina, Kevin Owens.(Hollander, Ross) Modified on 2/5/2019 to add Social Network Technologies, Inc. as a filer. (mam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ross A. Hollander on behalf of Stuart Bruck, David M. McNamee, Massimo Messina, Kevin Owens, Social Networking Technology, Inc.. (Hollander, Ross)
December 20, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Tatiana Hirsu - trial to be held in Wichita. (Andrusak, Michael)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tatiana Hirsu. (Andrusak, Michael)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4666041.), filed by Tatiana Hirsu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andrusak, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsu v. Social Networking Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massimo Messina
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Amezcua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Amezcua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Networking Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Bruck
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Owens
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. McNamee
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Hirsu
Represented By: David Prelle Eron
Represented By: Michael R. Andrusak
Represented By: Cody Branham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?