Mizell Farm, Inc. v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Plaintiff: Mizell Farms, Inc and Mizell Farm, Inc.
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01045
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time five days. Discovery deadline 12/31/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 1/31/2020. Mediation deadline 8/23/2019. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/12/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/25/19. (aw)
April 25, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE by CNH Industrial America LLC of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial & Rule 26(e) Supplemental Disclosures (Edwards, Patrick)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/19/19. (aw)
April 18, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY : Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale WILL BE CONDUCTED BY TELEPHONE. All counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 to participate on the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Allison W. Weyand for CNH Industrial America LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/18/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Allison W. Weyand to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4782503.) by Defendant CNH Industrial America LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A. Weyand, #2 ECF Registration Form A. Weyand)(Edwards, Patrick)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM at Room 403 U.S. Courthouse, 401 N. Market, Wichita, Kansas before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. COUNSEL SHOULD APPEAR IN PERSON FOR THE CONFERENCE. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/18/2019. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/7/19. (aw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant CNH Industrial America LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Edwards, Patrick)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CNH Industrial America LLC identifying Case New Holland Industrial, Inc. as corporate parent . (Edwards, Patrick)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by CNH Industrial America LLC.(Edwards, Patrick)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant CNH Industrial America LLC. (Edwards, Patrick)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 26, 2019 CIVIL FILING FEE PAID ONLINE BY CREDIT CARD: re: #1 Notice of Intent to Remove (paid $400 fee; Credit Card Receipt Number AKSDC-4724569). (Edwards, Patrick)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Patrick A. Edwards on behalf of CNH Industrial America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edwards, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizell Farm, Inc. v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mizell Farms, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mizell Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Marc A. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Edwards
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?