Neal v. Geico Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Kirstie N. Neal and Nicole Nesmith
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01051
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 403 U.S. Courthouse, 401 N. Market, Wichita, Kansas before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. COUNSEL WILL APPEAR IN PERSON. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/20/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/20/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/26/2019. (aw)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Geico Corporation as corporate parent . (Severson, Brooks)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Indemnity Company.(Severson, Brooks)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company with Local Rule 81.2. (Severson, Brooks)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Geico of Filing Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. (Severson, Brooks)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Geico - trial to be held in Wichita. (Severson, Brooks)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Geico. (Severson, Brooks)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 19-cv-128 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4734016.), filed by Geico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Severson, Brooks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirstie N. Neal
Represented By: Richard W. James
Represented By: Brendan P. Lykins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Nesmith
Represented By: Richard W. James
Represented By: Brendan P. Lykins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?