McTaggart v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeremy McTaggart
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01065
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 08/13/2019 by Jeremy McTaggart (Patterson, Gary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Defendant James River Insurance Company of taking deposition of Jeremy McTaggart on July 16, 2019 (Fielder, Clayton)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 6/19/2019. (sz)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 11/25/2019. Mediation deadline 8/30/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (Unknown) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 1/6/2020. Estimated trial time 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/18/19. (ss)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/18/2019.(AT&T Conference Line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant James River Insurance Company . (Fielder, Clayton)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Complaince by Jeremy McTaggart (Patterson, Gary)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/10/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/10/2019. All parties must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/7/19. (ss)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James River Insurance Company . (Fielder, Clayton)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by James River Insurance Company.(Fielder, Clayton)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/25/2019 for Defendant James River Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/09/2019. (jk)
March 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to James River Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jeremy McTaggart - trial to be held in Wichita. (Patterson, Gary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jeremy McTaggart. (Patterson, Gary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4744679.), filed by Jeremy McTaggart.(Patterson, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McTaggart v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Clayton T. Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy McTaggart
Represented By: Gary E. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?