Shelby Resources, LLC v. Duke Drilling Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shelby Resources, LLC
Defendant: Duke Drilling Company, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01068
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Duke Drilling Company, Inc.. Duke Drilling Company, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (White, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. White on behalf of Duke Drilling Company, Inc. (White, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Philip Davidson on behalf of Duke Drilling Company, Inc. (Davidson, J.)
May 31, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Duke Drilling Company, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Keith D. Tooley for Shelby Resources, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/22/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Keith D. Tooley to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4749901.) by Plaintiff Shelby Resources, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Basgall, Frank)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Shelby Resources, LLC. (Basgall, Frank)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4749663.), filed by Shelby Resources, LLC.(Basgall, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelby Resources, LLC v. Duke Drilling Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L. White
Represented By: J. Philip Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Resources, LLC
Represented By: Frank W. Basgall
Represented By: David E. Bengtson
Represented By: Keith D. Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?