Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Koehn et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Defendant: Tessa A. Koehn and Mary P. Devers
Case Number: 6:2019cv01071
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2019. Mediation deadline 10/28/2019. Discovery deadline 1/10/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/28/19.Mailed to pro se party Tessa A. Koehn by regular mail. (ss)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/28/2019. (AT&T Conference Line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE of Receipt re #17 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds. $250,806.95, Receipt Number: K4631057753 and $228.00, Receipt Number: K4631057754 received from Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company. (tvn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The of Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Wells, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Mary P. Devers. (Drill, Keith)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Wells, William)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/04/19. (jc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Jahn Schnetzer re #14 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION, #2 Exhibit B through H TO DECLARATION)(Wells, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America, The(Wells, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wells, William)
May 30, 2019 NOTICE re Pro Se Mailing: Document 13 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds mailled to Tessa A. Koehn at 1311 E 33rd St. Apt 203A Hays, KS 67601 on 5/30/2019 by regular mail (by JPO chambers). (mam)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 motion to deposit funds into the court registry. The motion and proposed order, which seek to have the funds deposited in an income-earning account, fail to comply with the requirements of D. Kan. Rule 67.1(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Jahn Schnetzer re #10 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit A, Article III., #2 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit B through H)(Wells, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America, The(Wells, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Wells, William)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE re Pro Se Mailing: Document #9 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling mailed to Tessa A. Koehn at 1311 E 33rd St Apt 203A Hays, KS 67601 on 5/16/2019 by regular mail. (mam)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/18/2019. All parties must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/16/19. (ss)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The upon Mary P. Devers served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Wells, William)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Mary P. Devers.(Drill, Keith)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Tessa A. Koehn. (jk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The upon Tessa A. Koehn served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019 (Wells, William)
March 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary P. Devers, Tessa A. Koehn (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Prudential Financial, Inc as corporate parent . (Wells, William)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Wells, William)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Prudential Insurance Company of America - trial to be held in Wichita. (Wells, William)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4751048.), filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wells, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Koehn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessa A. Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary P. Devers
Represented By: Keith E. Drill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: William A. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?