Estate of Jose Luis Lopez et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Estate of Jose Luis Lopez and Jennifer Lopez
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01073
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Response to RFPD and ROGG by Estate of Jose Luis Lopez, Jennifer Lopez. (Bretz, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 7/30/2019 by Estate of Jose Luis Lopez, Jennifer Lopez (Bretz, Matthew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents described in Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Blumreich, Craig)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Discovery Requests by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Blumreich, Craig)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 11/15/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 1/13/2020. Mediation deadline 9/13/2019. Mediation Notice filed or Confidential Settlement Report emailed to Magistrate Judge by 6/14/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Estimated trial time 4 days. Trial date to be subsequently set. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/23/2019. (mn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/14/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Estate of Jose Luis Lopez, Jennifer Lopez. (Young, Melinda)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/2/2019. (mn)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Blumreich, Craig)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 3/4/2019 by CERTIFIED MAIL. (Originally filed in Reno County, Kansas District Court on 3/7/2019.) (mam)
March 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from Reno County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records Ex 1: Petition, #2 State Court Records Ex 2: Summons, #3 State Court Records Ex 3: Alias Summons, #4 State Court Records Ex 4: Entry of Appearance, #5 State Court Records Ex 5: Return of Service of Summons)(Blumreich, Craig)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH NOTICE REQUIREMENT by Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Blumreich, Craig)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Blumreich, Craig)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Reno County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000048 Trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4753359.), filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1: State Court Petition, #2 Ex 2: State Court Summons, #3 Ex 3: State Court Alias Summons, #4 Ex 4: State Court Entry of Appearance, #5 Ex 5: State Court Return of Service)(Blumreich, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jose Luis Lopez et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig C. Blumreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jose Luis Lopez
Represented By: Matthew L. Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lopez
Represented By: Matthew L. Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?