Travis v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Lonny D. Travis
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv01093
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Schaffer, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Safeco Insurance Company of America of Subpoenas (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time two to three days. Discovery deadline 12/13/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 1/31/2020. Mediation deadline 9/9/2019. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/2/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/18/19. (aw) Modified on 6/18/2019 to change the dispositive motion deadline to 2020. (mam)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Opening Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
June 11, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 6, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY to Reset Hearings: At the request of counsel, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/11/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Lonny D. Travis . (Steadman, Kyle)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/3/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/3/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/30/19. (aw)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Safeco Insurance Company of America of Proof of Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 19, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. as corporate parent . (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000494-TC Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4783078.), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lyeshchenko, Darya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travis v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Darya Vladimirovna Lyeshchenko
Represented By: Mark B. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonny D. Travis
Represented By: Kyle J. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?