Bailey v. Metal-Fab, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alisha Bailey
Defendant: Metal-Fab, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01098
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties informal request to submit their disclosures is granted. The parties shall submit their disclosures to chambers by 7/17/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/3/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 2:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/10/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/10/2019. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/13/19. (ss)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Metal-Fab, Inc..(Rupe, Alan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/05/2019 for Defendant Metal-Fab, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/22/2019. (jk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of Metal-Fab, Inc. (Rupe, Alan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Alisha Bailey upon Metal-Fab, Inc. served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019 (Tibbets, Gaye)
April 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metal-Fab, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
April 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Alisha Bailey. (Tibbets, Gaye) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 ***Corrected Main Document***) (sz).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4790477.), filed by Alisha Bailey.(Tibbets, Gaye)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Metal-Fab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal-Fab, Inc.
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Bailey
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?