Bates et al v. Flemming et al
Plaintiff: Craig A. Bates and Karla R. Bates
Defendant: Guy M. Flemming, GuyCat, LLC and Pratt County, Kansas
Case Number: 6:2019cv01101
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to show cause why this action should not be remanded to state court. The parties' responses to this order are due on or before July 17, 2019, and may not exceed 10 pages. In the event that the parties, or any of them, take the position that Pratt County is an indispensable party, a short response is all that is necessary. Reply briefs may be filed by July 24, 2019, and may not exceed 5 pages. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 7/3/2019. (sz)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Craig A. Bates, Karla R. Bates re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Beverlin, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Craig A. Bates, Karla R. Bates upon Pratt County, Kansas served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Beverlin, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (DISREGARD, see #16 for the corrected filing) -- NOTICE OF SERVICE by Craig A. Bates, Karla R. Bates of Summons Pratt County, Kansas (Beverlin, John) Modified on 6/11/2019, filed using the wrong event. (mam)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Guy M. Flemming(Branham, Cody)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Guy M. Flemming (Branham, Cody)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pratt County, Kansas (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss by Guy M. Flemming re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Branham, Cody)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guy M. Flemming, GuyCat, LLC, Pratt County, Kansas, filed by Craig A. Bates, Karla R. Bates. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Beverlin, John)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Craig A. Bates, Karla R. Bates re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Beverlin, John)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE - Summons forwarded by the Kansas Secretary of State to Tracee Norfleet. (Originally filed in the Pratt County District Court on 2/8/2019 as a return of service for Defendant GuyCat, LLC.) (mam)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE - Defendant GuyCat, LLC served on 1/30/2019; summons delivered to Kansas Secretary of State by FedEx. (Originally filed in the Pratt County District Court on 1/30/2019.) (mam)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Guy M. Flemming (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branham, Cody)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Guy M. Flemming (Branham, Cody)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Pratt County District Court. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. J, #11 Ex. K, #12 Ex. L, #13 Ex. M, #14 Ex. N, #15 Ex. O, #16 Ex. P, #17 Ex. Q, #18 Ex. R, #19 Ex. S, #20 Ex. T, #21 Ex. U, #22 Ex. V, #23 Ex. W, #24 Ex. X, #25 Ex. Y, #26 Ex. Z, #27 Ex. AA, #28 Ex. BB, #29 Ex. CC)(Branham, Cody)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Designation of Place of Trial by Guy M. Flemming. (Branham, Cody)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Guy M. Flemming - trial to be held in Wichita. (Branham, Cody)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Guy M. Flemming. (Branham, Cody)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pratt County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000005 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4791387.), filed by Guy M. Flemming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branham, Cody)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates et al v. Flemming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy M. Flemming
Represented By: Cody Branham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GuyCat, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A. Bates
Represented By: John D. Beverlin, II
Represented By: Joshua V.C. Nicolay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla R. Bates
Represented By: John D. Beverlin, II
Represented By: Joshua V.C. Nicolay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?