Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The v. Schuermann
Plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The
Defendant: Stan Schuermann
Interested Party: Richard Mangum, Sr.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01102
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The upon Stan Schuermann served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019 (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Mangum, Sr.(Hogan, Paul)
June 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stan Schuermann (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER of Service of Summons by Plaintiff Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The. (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The identifying Ohio Casualty Corporation as corporate parent . (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The - trial to be held in Wichita. (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 29, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Lyeshchenko, Darya)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4791618.), filed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lyeshchenko, Darya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The v. Schuermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Darya Vladimirovna Lyeshchenko
Represented By: Mark B. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Schuermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Richard Mangum, Sr.
Represented By: Paul D. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?