State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Enamorado et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: S P, E J P.R., Drilan Xiomara Gutierrez Portillo, Geiser Paz Enamorado, M R, Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, Megan Drew Wieslander Rasure and Brilian Gutierrez
Case Number: 6:2019cv01116
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #6 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without Prejudice by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Sanders, James)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STRIKING re #1 Complaint (attorney). Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 17(c)(1), the Complaint is invalid and is STRICKEN from the record. The Plaintiff is instructed to file an Amended Complaint with all minor parties set out as required per Rule 17. Any changes that need to be made to the public docket sheet will be made by the Court. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $400, receipt number W4631018570. (mam)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Sanders, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 (STRICKEN PER DE #4) -- COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James) Modified on 5/9/2019 to change the trial location/designation. (mam) Modified on 5/10/2019 document restricted. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Enamorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E J P.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drilan Xiomara Gutierrez Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geiser Paz Enamorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Drew Wieslander Rasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brilian Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Sanders
Represented By: Penny A. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?