Airliner LLC et al v. Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Airliner LLC, Four S, Inc. and Airliner Motel Corp.
Defendant: Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01117
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Airliner LLC, Four S, Inc. of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Defendant (Rathbun, Randall)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #8 Order to Show Cause. The court is satisfied it has diversity subject matter jurisdiction and this matter shall proceed accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/24/2019. (jc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 Order to Show Cause, Joint by Plaintiffs Airliner LLC, Four S, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Randall Rathbun, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael David Blinson)(Rathbun, Randall)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karl A. Schulz for Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Ziemianski for Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavits by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company re #10 MOTION for attorney Karl A. Schulz to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4831296.), #9 MOTION for attorney Joseph A. Ziemianski to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4831273.). (MacArthur, Cheri)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Karl A. Schulz to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4831296.) by Defendant Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Karl A. Schulz, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form - Karl Schulz)(MacArthur, Cheri)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Joseph A. Ziemianski to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4831273.) by Defendant Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - J Ziemianski, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form - J Ziemianski)(MacArthur, Cheri)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By June 21, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report, with affidavits attached, demonstrating the citizenship of each of the parties and showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/07/19. (jc)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/11/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/11/2019. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/7/19. (ss)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company identifying IAT Insurance Group as corporate parent . (MacArthur, Cheri)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company.(MacArthur, Cheri)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Airliner LLC, Four S, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Rathbun, Randall)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Airliner LLC, Four S, Inc. upon Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Rathbun, Randall)
May 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Airliner LLC a/k/a Airliner Motel Corp., Four S, Inc.. (Rathbun, Randall)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4802405.), filed by Airliner LLC a/k/a Airliner Motel Corp., Four S, Inc..(Rathbun, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airliner LLC et al v. Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airliner LLC
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four S, Inc.
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airliner Motel Corp.
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acceptance Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Karl A. Schulz
Represented By: Cheri L. MacArthur
Represented By: Joseph A. Ziemianski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?