Dairyland Insurance Company v. Paz et al

Plaintiff: Dairyland Insurance Company
Defendant: Brilean Xiomara Gutierrez Portillo, S. Y. P. G., Megan Wiesland Rasure, E. R. and M. R.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Geiser Paz and Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo
3Rd Party Defendant: Hazel Barragan
Case Number: 6:2019cv01118
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying without prejudice #16 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. Plaintiff Dairyland Insurance Company and Defendants Geiser Paz, Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, and S.Y.P.G., a minor by and through her general guardian Geiser Paz seek a stay of proceedings while they participate in mediation. However, the docket contains no indication that Diaryland has served Defendant Brilean Xiomara Gutierrez Portillo or Megan Wiesland Rasure, individually and as the natural mother and guardian of minors E.R. and M.R. The motion states that Ms. Rasure's counsel agrees to mediation and that Third-Party Defendant Hazel Barragan also agrees to mediation, but the motion does not state the positions of the other parties to this lawsuit. Furthermore, the Joint Motion does not specify a scheduled mediation date but instead projects only that the parties expect to complete mediation before the "end of October." Because there is no record of service on certain defendants, because the motion does not state Brilean Xiomara Gutierrez Portillo's position, and because of the indeterminate lengthy extension requested, the court denies the motion to stay without prejudice to refiling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Dairyland Insurance Company(Brigg, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Dairyland Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Brigg, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKET ANNOTATION re #13 : The pdf originally attached to #13 was for a different case. The corrected document has been attached to #13 and also this entry for notification purposes. (jk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, Geiser Paz upon Hazel Barragan served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019 (Pistotnik, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jk).
May 31, 2019 THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hazel Barragan (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Hazel Barragan, filed by Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, Geiser Paz.(Pistotnik, Bradley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, Geiser Paz.(Pistotnik, Bradley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley A. Pistotnik on behalf of Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, Geiser Paz. (Pistotnik, Bradley)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dairyland Insurance Company upon Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019 (Brigg, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dairyland Insurance Company upon Geiser Paz served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019 (Brigg, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dairyland Insurance Company identifying Sentry Insurance a Mutual Company as corporate parent . (Brigg, John)
May 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo, Geiser Paz (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dairyland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Brigg, John)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STRIKING re #1 Complaint (attorney). Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 17(c)(1), the Complaint is invalid and is STRICKEN from the record. The Plaintiff is instructed to file an Amended Complaint with all minor parties set out as required per Rule 17. Any changes that need to be made to the public docket sheet will be made by the Court. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by W. James Foland on behalf of Dairyland Insurance Company. (Foland, W.)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Dairyland Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Brigg, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dairyland Insurance Company. (Brigg, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 (STRICKEN PER DE #5)-- COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4802411.), filed by Dairyland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Brigg, John) Modified on 5/10/2019 restricted document. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dairyland Insurance Company v. Paz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brilean Xiomara Gutierrez Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Y. P. G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Wiesland Rasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dairyland Insurance Company
Represented By: W. James Foland
Represented By: John M. Brigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Geiser Paz
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Donilda Maribel Gutierrez Portillo
Represented By: Bradley A. Pistotnik
Represented By: John Corey Sucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hazel Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?