Jones v. Fay Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Roger N. Jones
Defendant: Fay Loan Servicing, LLC and Fay Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01124
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Roger N. Jones upon Fay Servicing, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 (Grillot, Nicholas)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Roger N. Jones upon Fay Servicing, LLC served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019 (Grillot, Nicholas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Roger N. Jones as to Fay Loan Servicing, LLC. (Grillot, Nicholas)
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fay Servicing, LLC (two addresses provided, issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Amend/Correct Case Caption. The Court orders that case caption be modified to reflect that the named defendant is "Fay Servicing, LLC," not "Fay Loan Servicing, LLC." Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/20/2019. (bh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (attorney) Case Caption by Plaintiff Roger N. Jones (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Grillot, Nicholas)
May 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fay Loan Servicing, LLC (two addressed provided, issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4803921.), filed by Roger N Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibits 1 - 11, #2 Civil Coversheet)(Grillot, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Fay Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger N. Jones
Represented By: Nicholas R. Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?