Community National Bank & Trust v. EMC Property and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Community National Bank & Trust
Defendant: EMC Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01147
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY to Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/26/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/26/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/21/19. (aw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by EMC Property and Casualty Company.(Powell, Marc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to EMC Property and Casualty Company. (FILED IN BUTLER COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 3/5/2019) (sz)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to EMC Property and Casualty Company. (FILED IN BUTLER COUNTY DISTRICT COURT 12/10/2018) (sz)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from Butler County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records Alias Summons, #2 State Court Records Clerk's Extension, #3 State Court Records Entry of Appearance, #4 State Court Records Notice to Court and Plaintiff of Removal, #5 State Court Records Response from Insurance Commissioner, #6 State Court Records Return from Insurance Commissioner, #7 State Court Records Summons for Amended Petition, #8 State Court Records Summons)(Powell, Marc)
June 6, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant EMC Property and Casualty Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Powell, Marc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant EMC Property and Casualty Company. (Powell, Marc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County District Court, case number 2018-CV-0281 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4829549.), filed by EMC Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Amended Petition, #2 State Court Petition Petition)(Powell, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community National Bank & Trust v. EMC Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Marc A. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community National Bank & Trust
Represented By: Mark D. Molner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?