Mcbeath v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Kayla Mcbeath
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 6:2019cv01160
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (jk)
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Entered by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 6/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Kayla Mcbeath (Overton, Kathleen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Kayla Mcbeath - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kayla Mcbeath. (Overton, Kathleen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Kayla Mcbeath.(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcbeath v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Mcbeath
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?