Steven Volkswagen, Inc. et al v. Zurich Agency Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Volkswagen, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich Agency Services, Inc. and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01161
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
2 Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: estimated trial time 5 days. Discovery deadline 12/20/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 1/31/2020. Mediation deadline 12/20/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM), or by telephone (888-363-4749; access code 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/14/2019. (jal)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/14/2019. (bh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Zurich American Insurance Company of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Steven Volkswagen, Inc. of Amended Initial Disclosures F.R.C.P. 26 (Ayesh, Mark)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Steven Volkswagen, Inc. of P's F.R.C.P. 26 Disclosures (Ayesh, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Assouad, Jean-Paul)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Zurich American Insurance Company, filed by Steven Volkswagen, Inc..(Ayesh, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party Defendant. Fed. R. Civ. P. 25 governs substitution of parties if a party dies, becomes incompetent, transfers its interest, or if a public officer separates from office. The rule does not provide for substituting one corporate entity with a different corporate entity. To that end, the court denies plaintiffs' request to substitute parties but grants plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint that omits Zurich Agency Services, Inc. and names Zurich American Insurance Company. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint by July 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by Plaintiff Steven Volkswagen, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Ayesh, Mark)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/24/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/7/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/10/2019. (ht)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Steven Volkswagen, Inc. upon Zurich Agency Services, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/24/2019 (Ayesh, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/24/2019 for Defendant Zurich Agency Services, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/03/2019. (jk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Destiny L. Bounds on behalf of Zurich Agency Services, Inc.. (Bounds, Destiny)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jean-Paul Assouad on behalf of Zurich Agency Services, Inc.. (Assouad, Jean-Paul)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell added. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/24/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
June 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich Agency Services, Inc. (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (sz)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steven Volkswagen, Inc. (Ayesh, Mark) Modified on 6/17/2019 to correct the filer. (mam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Steven Volkswagen, Inc., Steven Volkswagen, Inc. dba Steven Infiniti. (Ayesh, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4838891.), filed by Steven Volkswagen, Inc., Steven Volkswagen, Inc. dba Steven Infiniti.(Ayesh, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Volkswagen, Inc. et al v. Zurich Agency Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich Agency Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jean-Paul Assouad
Represented By: Destiny L. Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jean-Paul Assouad
Represented By: Destiny L. Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Volkswagen, Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Represented By: David Michael Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?