Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. XY Bar LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Peer International Corporation, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. and Beechwood Music Corporation
Defendant: XY Bar LLC and Jerry Nguyen
Case Number: 6:2019cv01165
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
2 Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Jerry Nguyen, XY Bar LLC.(Harper, Kurt)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers due 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by XY Bar LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Harper, Kurt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendants Jerry Nguyen, XY Bar LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Harper, Kurt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/29/2019 for Defendants Jerry Nguyen, XY Bar LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/15/2019. (jk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kurt A. Harper on behalf of All Defendants (Harper, Kurt)
July 3, 2019 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jerry Nguyen (issued to attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer added. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/24/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jerry Nguyen, XY Bar LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Peer International Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC . (Woofter, Hannah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Peer International Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Woofter, Hannah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Peer International Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Woofter, Hannah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Woofter, Hannah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4842860.), filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Peer International Corporation, EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation.(Woofter, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. XY Bar LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc.
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peer International Corporation
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Hannah L. Woofter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XY Bar LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Nguyen
Represented By: Kurt A. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?