Crenshaw v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Larry Crenshaw
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01166
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Severson, Brooks)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/09/2019 for Defendant GEICO Indemnity Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/24/2019. (jk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brooks G. Severson on behalf of GEICO Indemnity Company. (Severson, Brooks)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Larry Crenshaw. (Omlid, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GEICO Indemnity Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4845105.), filed by Larry M Crenshaw.(Omlid, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenshaw v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Crenshaw
Represented By: Christopher Jon Omlid
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?