Belknap v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steven Belknap
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01167
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Steven Belknap upon Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 (Omlid, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, filed by Steven Belknap.(Omlid, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Steven Belknap. (Omlid, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4845467.), filed by Steven Belknap.(Omlid, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belknap v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Belknap
Represented By: Christopher Jon Omlid
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?