Marks et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Michael Marks and Dorothy Marks
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 6:2019cv01188
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #9 Letter addressed to the Sedgwick County District Court regarding the remand of case number 2019-cv-001188-CO (signed for/delivered on 8/7/2019). (mam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Sedgwick County District Court regarding #8 remand to state court. Sent by Certified Mail tracking number 70190700000059273097. (jk)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER REMANDING TO STATE COURT granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remand this case to the District Court of Sedgwick County and close this matter. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/05/2019. (jk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Dorothy Marks, Michael Marks (McMaster, Kevin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/09/2019 for Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/26/2019. (jk)
July 19, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company with Local Rule 81.2. (Compton, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Certificate of Filing Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Compton, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Compton, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Compton, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2019-cv-1188 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4867720.), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Compton, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marks
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Marks
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Thomas Chet Compton
Represented By: William L. Townsley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?