Wilkens vs. ValueHealth LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise Wilkens
Defendant: ValueHealth LLC and Benefit Management LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01193
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Room 403 U.S. Courthouse, 401 N. Market, Wichita, Kansas before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/18/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/12/19. (aw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Benefit Management LLC, ValueHealth LLC.(Shulda, Teresa)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Benefit Management LLC and ValueHealth LLC answer or other responsive pleading due 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/3/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Benefit Management LLC, ValueHealth LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Shulda, Teresa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/03/2019 for Defendants Benefit Management LLC, ValueHealth LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/16/2019. (jk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Teresa L. Shulda on behalf of Benefit Management LLC, ValueHealth LLC (Shulda, Teresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Denise Wilkens upon Benefit Management LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Tibbets, Gaye)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Denise Wilkens upon ValueHealth LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Tibbets, Gaye)
July 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benefit Management LLC, ValueHealth LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Denise Wilkens. (Tibbets, Gaye)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4873224.), filed by Denise Wilkens.(Tibbets, Gaye)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkens vs. ValueHealth LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ValueHealth LLC
Represented By: Teresa L. Shulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Management LLC
Represented By: Teresa L. Shulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wilkens
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?