Todd v. Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Todd
Defendant: Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc., John Habiger and Steve Williams
Case Number: 6:2019cv01197
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, as agreed to by the parties, for inspection and reproduction of Kansas Human Rights Commission Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/3/2019. (ts)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/19/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2019. (ts)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Steve Williams.(Calhoun, Penny)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by John Habiger.(Calhoun, Penny)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Penny A. Calhoun on behalf of John Habiger, Steve Williams. (Calhoun, Penny)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael L. Brown on behalf of John Habiger, Steve Williams. (Brown, Michael)
August 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Habiger, Steve Williams (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc..(Calhoun, Penny)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail upon Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc. Served on 7/18/2019. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN SEDGWICK COUNTY 7/23/2019) (sz)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Calhoun, Penny)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc.. (Calhoun, Penny)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc. identifying none as corporate parent . (Calhoun, Penny)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Calhoun, Penny)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc.. (Calhoun, Penny)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County, case number 2019-CV-001370-CD Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4881326.), filed by Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc..(Calhoun, Penny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Todd
Represented By: Sean M. McGivern
Represented By: Susan R. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbert Funeral Services, Inc.
Represented By: Penny A. Calhoun
Represented By: Michael L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Habiger
Represented By: Penny A. Calhoun
Represented By: Michael L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Williams
Represented By: Penny A. Calhoun
Represented By: Michael L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?