Bates v. Wichita State University
Plaintiff: Sheila Bates
Defendant: Wichita State University
Case Number: 6:2019cv01206
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
2 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by October 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Wichita State University (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Moses, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/17/2019 for Defendant Wichita State University to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/30/2019. (jk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David H. Moses on behalf of Wichita State University. (Moses, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Sheila Bates upon Wichita State University served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Michel, Larry)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(rel)
August 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wichita State University. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sheila Bates. (Michel, Larry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4886953.), filed by Sheila Bates.(Michel, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Wichita State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Bates
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Represented By: Laurel A Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita State University
Represented By: Molly M. Gordon
Represented By: David H. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?