Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Knoll et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Jarek Mader, Brittney J. Knoll, Chelsea Mader and Joshua M. Knoll
Case Number: 6:2019cv01208
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/7/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/7/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/7/19. (aw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Insurance Corporation by Chelsea Mader, Jarek Mader.(Andrusak, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/24/2019 for Defendants Chelsea Mader, Jarek Mader to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/09/2019. (jk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael R. Andrusak on behalf of Chelsea Mader, Jarek Mader (Andrusak, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Joshua M. Knoll.(Koksal, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Brittney J. Knoll.(Koksal, James)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Liberty Insurance Corporation upon Jarek Mader served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019 (Moothart, Bruce)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Liberty Insurance Corporation upon Chelsea Mader served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019 (Moothart, Bruce)
August 27, 2019 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brittney J. Knoll (issued to attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
August 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brittney J. Knoll, Joshua M. Knoll, Chelsea Mader, Jarek Mader. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Insurance Corporation identifying Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as corporate parent (Moothart, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Redacted Corporate Disclosure Statement) (mam).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Liberty Insurance Corporation - trial to be held in Wichita. (Moothart, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Redacted Designation of Place of Trial) (mam).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Moothart, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet) (mam).
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4887626.), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Policy)(Moothart, Bruce) Modified on 8/9/2019 to restrict the main document. The complaint includes the full name of the minor child. (mam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #3 Redacted Complaint for Declaratory Judgment) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Knoll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Represented By: Deena B. Jenab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarek Mader
Represented By: Michael R. Andrusak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney J. Knoll
Represented By: James S. Koksal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Mader
Represented By: Michael R. Andrusak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua M. Knoll
Represented By: James S. Koksal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?