Francois v. L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency et al
Plaintiff: Jeren Francois
Defendant: LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency, Builders FirstSource - Atlantic Group, LLC, Lippert Components, Inc., L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency and ProBuild Company LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01209
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/24/19. (alm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency.(Buck, Cory)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jeren Francois (McGivern, Sean)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jeren Francois Amended (McGivern, Sean)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jeren Francois (McGivern, Sean)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/20/2019 for Defendant L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/05/2019. (jk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/19/2019 for Defendant Builders FirstSource - Atlantic Group, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/05/2019. (jk)
August 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jeren Francois as to Defendant Lippert Components, Inc. (McGivern, Sean)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency, Lippert Components, Inc., ProBuild Company LLC, filed by Jeren Francois.(McGivern, Sean)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION by Jeren Francois. (McGivern, Sean)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/06/2019 for Defendant L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/20/2019. (jk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/05/2019 for Defendant Builders FirstSource - Atlantic Group, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/16/2019. (jk)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing for Removal with the Notice of Removal filed in this Court by LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buck, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing for Removal with the Notice of Removal filed in this Court by LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency. (Buck, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency identifying None as corporate parent . (Buck, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency - trial to be held in Wichita. (Buck, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency. (Buck, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2019-CV-001150-CD Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4888444.), filed by LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buck, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency
Represented By: Cory R. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders FirstSource - Atlantic Group, LLC
Represented By: Trecia Moore
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippert Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L S I Corporation - Temporary Services & Placement Agency
Represented By: Cory R. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProBuild Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeren Francois
Represented By: Sean M. McGivern
Represented By: Donald N. Peterson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?