Knobbe v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: Keat Knobbe
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01248
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Deere & Company re #11 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, (Ricke, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The court orders expedited briefing on #11 plaintiff Keat Knobbe's Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendant Deere & Company's response brief is due by November 6, 2019, and shall be limited to 3 pages. Plaintiff's reply brief is due by November 12, 2019, and shall be limited to 1 and 1/2 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/30/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Keat Knobbe re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Appendix Corvais v. Ventamatic)(Powell, Marc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Keat Knobbe (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Powell, Marc)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline 10/29/2019. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Keat Knobbe (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Powell, Marc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deere & Company . (Daniel, Peter)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Deere & Company (Daniel, Peter)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/17/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Deere & Company served by CERTIFIED MAIL on 8/23/2019. (Originally filed in the Wichita County, Kansas District Court on 8/30/2019.) (mam)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Wichita County, Kansas. (Ricke, Andrew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Court Filings by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Ricke, Andrew)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Deere & Company. (Ricke, Andrew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wichita County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000005 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4921045.), filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings)(Ricke, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knobbe v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keat Knobbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Andrew Jason Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?