Anderson v. Wilcox et al
Plaintiff: Dewayne Anderson
Defendant: Gordon Ramsey, Gregg Wilcox, Kurt Holmes, Comcare, Tim Kaufman, John Doe, Gus (lnu), Comcare Crisis, Wichita Police Department, Randy Patterson, Sylviea (lnu), Air Capital Rentals, Jenn (lnu) and Tisha Darland
Case Number: 6:2019cv01263
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing: Documents #4 , #5 returned mail was resent to Dewayne Anderson at updated address of 141 W. Elm Street, Wichita, KS 67203 on 11/5/2019 by regular mail. (jk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dewayne Anderson to 141 W. Elm Street, Wichita, Kansas 67203. (jk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN Mail received re #4 , #5 addressed to Dewayne Anderson at 923 N. Glendale St. #4, Wichita, KS 67208. Not Remailed. (jk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN Mail received re #4 , #5 addressed to Dewayne Anderson at 923 N. Glendale St. #4, Wichita, KS 67208. Not Remailed. (jk)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE re Pro Se Mailing: Documents #4 / #5 Memorandum & Order on Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Report & Recommendation for Dismissal mailed to Dewayne Anderson at 923 N. Glendale St. #4 Wichita, KS 67208 on 10/1/2019 by regular mail. (mam)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Dewayne Anderson mailed to Dewayne Anderson on 9/30/2019 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 7019 0700 0000 5927 3493. (aw)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal re #1 Complaint filed by Dewayne Anderson. This document also serves as the ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is included in the Court's docketing system as two entries for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/30/19. Mailed to pro se party DeWayne Anderson by certified mail. (df)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This Order also serves as the REPORT & RECOMMENDATION of Dismissal to the District Court. It is included in the Court's docketing system as two entries for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/30/19. (df)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dewayne Anderson (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Dewayne Anderson. (jk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Dewayne Anderson. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Wilcox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcare Crisis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylviea (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Capital Rentals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenn (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tisha Darland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?