United States of America v. Featherngill et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Unknown Spouses of the deceased borrower and other Defendants, The, Unknown Stockholders, Officers, Successors, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of Defendants as are existing, dissolved or dormant corporations, Unknown Guardians, Conservators and Trustees of Defendants as are minors or are in any way under legal disability, Unknown Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, Successors and Assignees of Defendants as are or were partners or in partnership, Joy Featherngill, Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of the Deceased Borrower, The and Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of any Person alleged to be deceased and made Defendants
Case Number: 6:2019cv01299
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date 12/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Publication)(Jacobs, Michelle)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Joy Featherngill waiver sent on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Jacobs, Michelle)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Service by Publication of the Unknown Defendants pursuant to K.S.A. 60-307(a)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/20/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service By Publication on Unknown Defendants by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Service by Publication on Unknown Defendants)(Jacobs, Michelle)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE by United States of America of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and copies of the Complaint, ECF Filing Notice, and this Certificate of Mailing (Jacobs, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jacobs, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Promissory Note, #2 Ex. B - Mortgage)(Jacobs, Michelle)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Featherngill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouses of the deceased borrower and other Defendants, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stockholders, Officers, Successors, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of Defendants as are existing, dissolved or dormant corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Guardians, Conservators and Trustees of Defendants as are minors or are in any way under legal disability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, Successors and Assignees of Defendants as are or were partners or in partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Featherngill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of the Deceased Borrower, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of any Person alleged to be deceased and made Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?