Fitzpatrick v. Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Fitzpatrick
Defendant: Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01328
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/19/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/19/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/16/20. (aw)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Rondeau, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Rondeau, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc..(Rondeau, Mark)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/16/2020 for Defendant Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/30/2019. (jk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Rondeau on behalf of Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.. (Rondeau, Mark)
December 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
December 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thomas Fitzpatrick. (Galdean, Trinidad)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4998397.), filed by Thomas Fitzpatrick.(Galdean, Trinidad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzpatrick v. Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Rondeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Trinidad P. Galdean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?