Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. v. Francis et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Genetics, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Francis, John Does 1-25 and M & S Francis Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01341
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 07:2321
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell; Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 2/12/2020; Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/26/2020; Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/4/20. (ctv)
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Francis, M & S Francis Farms, Inc..(Lindskog, Ashlyn)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/03/2020 for Defendants M & S Francis Farms, Inc., Michael Francis to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/17/2020. (jk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. upon M & S Francis Farms, Inc. served on 12/29/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 (Rapp, David)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. upon Michael Francis served on 12/29/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 (Rapp, David)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam L. Hopkins and Mark Murphey Henry for Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Entered by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Mark Murphey Henry re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 by Plaintiff Oklahoma Genetics, Inc.(Rapp, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Adam L. Hopkins re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 by Plaintiff Oklahoma Genetics, Inc.(Rapp, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Adam L. Hopkins and Mark Murphey Henry to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5012412.) by Plaintiff Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Rapp, David)
December 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Francis, M & S Francis Farms, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Oklahoma Genetics, Inc.. (Rapp, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Rapp, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Rapp, David)
December 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $400, receipt number AKSDC-5008918. (mam)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Oklahoma Genetics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rapp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Genetics, Inc. v. Francis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Genetics, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Rapp
Represented By: Mark Murphey Henry
Represented By: Adam L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Francis
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Ashlyn Brianne Lindskog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & S Francis Farms, Inc.
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Ashlyn Brianne Lindskog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?